UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (SOUTH EAST LONDON)

Charity number: 1044428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £16.19k £12.38k £20.86k £20.89k £21.25k
Total expenditure £19.72k £20.89k £20.76k £28.42k £28.42k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A