UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (SOUTH EAST LONDON)

Charity number: 1044428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christine Melville Trustee 26 March 2021 None on record
Richard Alan Beck Trustee 26 March 2021 None on record
Kiran Patel Trustee 20 September 2018
LEWISHAM PENSIONERS FORUM Received: On time
Hazel Lilian Beale Trustee 20 September 2018 None on record
Mark Serebriakoff Trustee 26 March 2021 None on record
Eileen Wyatt Trustee 23 November 2016 None on record
Susan Mead Chair 06 January 2016 None on record
Tim Crossley Trustee 26 March 2021 None on record
Martha Lucia Fox Trustee 17 May 2019 None on record