UPLANDS JUNIOR SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funding of various activities including visits of pupils to art galleries, historic houses etc. Visits to school by theatre companies, musicians, and artists.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 28 February 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS DEBBIE ANSLOW | Chair | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Cox | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Meena Chuhan | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Elbehiry | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Serina Balu | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Raakhee Ramesh | Trustee | 26 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marie Bagley | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Juli Forrest | Trustee | 25 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mr Ramesh Humar QPM | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Pick | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|||||
Suzanne Webster-Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MARION BULL | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.75k | £2.15k | £18.93k | £3.63k | £7.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.48k | £4.88k | £15.54k | £2.48k | £4.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 July 2023 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 July 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 March 2022 | 266 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 March 2021 | 273 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 FEBRUARY 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF UPLANDS JUNIOR SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Lloyd Drive
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV4 5NJ
- Phone:
- 0190258870
- Website:
-
uplandsjuniorschool.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window