Trustees THE ACTORS OF DIONYSUS
Charity number: 1044532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW POWELL | Chair | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shelley Warren | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Beaton | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Katherine Cecilia Harloe | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
OLGA GEKHT | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GEORGE GREGORY BULLEN | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEVE ALBERT COWTON | Trustee | 23 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL EDWIN Dixon | Trustee | 31 July 2014 |
|
|||||
MARIA ATHINI | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE BRIDGET LIVESEY | Trustee | 09 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.