THE FRIENDS OF MOULSHAM JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity number: 1044556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 March 2021 272 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 19 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required