THE FRIENDS OF MOULSHAM JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity number: 1044556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £7.38k £11.56k £15.48k £18.57k £12.20k
Total expenditure £3.86k £6.87k £8.05k £20.69k £5.36k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A