Trustees THE FRIENDS OF HAPPISBURGH LIGHTHOUSE

Charity number: 1044590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Guy Tweedale Trustee 13 February 2022
None on record
Jennifer Turner Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
David Vyse Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
Geoffrey Turner Trustee 28 June 2019
None on record
Rosalie Gibb Trustee 10 June 2015
None on record
SHAUN FORDYCE Trustee 08 November 2013
None on record
Carol Palfrey Trustee 06 June 1999
WENN EVANS CENTRE
Received: On time
THE SEA OF FAITH NETWORK
Received: On time
CHARLES SUMMERS RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
PATRICK JOHN TUBBY Trustee
HAPPISBURGH LIGHTHOUSE TRUST
Received: On time
JOY ELIZABETH TUBBY Trustee
None on record