ST MARKS SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All parents of children attending St. Mark's CE Primary School in Cold Ash are automatically members of the School Association. A small number of volunteers drawn from this group are named Trustees who meet regularly to plan fundraising activities to benefit the school such as the Christmas Fayre, quiz nights, school discos, textile collections and the Summer Fete.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £4,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 01 March 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laurence Grew | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.11k | £20.08k | £31.70k | £29.48k | £29.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.76k | £19.44k | £36.37k | £27.91k | £23.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 OCTOBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Marks C of E School
Hermitage Road. Cold Ash Hill
Cold Ash
THATCHAM
RG18 9PT
- Phone:
- 01635 862600
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window