Financial history THE FRIENDS OF GREETLAND SCHOOL

Charity number: 1044657
Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £6.33k £10.11k £5.94k £1.12k £13.64k
Total expenditure £10.73k £7.46k £7.32k £5.87k £6.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A