Trustees THE FRIENDS OF GREETLAND SCHOOL

Charity number: 1044657
Charity reporting is overdue by 15 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Steven Richard Bennett Trustee 19 November 2018
None on record
Nicola Lee Webb Trustee 13 November 2018
None on record
Shamim Ghani Trustee 19 October 2016
None on record
Ruth Jane Parker Trustee 19 October 2016
None on record
Jayne Firth Trustee 29 March 2016
THE GREETLAND ACADEMY SCHOOL FUND
Overdue by 684 days
Andrew Charnock Trustee 22 September 2015
None on record
Louise Iredale Trustee 26 February 2015
None on record