THE MITFORD FAMILY TRUST

Charity number: 1044671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £5.13k £4.76k £5.29k £5.20k £5.40k
Total expenditure £15.15k £292 £0 £1.25k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A