THE EVELYN OLDFIELD UNIT

Charity number: 1044681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £136.18k £215.35k £196.13k £150.38k £96.39k
Total expenditure £217.65k £195.40k £169.76k £189.43k £120.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £75.08k £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.98k £75.08k £95.80k £25.00k £25.00k