Dogfen lywodraethu CAMP SIMCHA

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 FEB 1995 AS AMENDED ON 21 NOV 2005 AS AMENDED ON 22 SEP 2014 AS AMENDED ON 16 NOV 2017 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10 DEC 2018 as amended on 05 Mar 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO RELIEVE JEWISH CHILDREN OF ALL AGES AND YOUNG ADULTS AFFECTED BY CANCER, LIFE THREATENING ILLNESSES OR ANY CHRONIC OR SERIOUS ILLNESSES AND TO PROVIDE SUPPORT FOR THEIR FAMILIES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.