INFECTIOUS DISEASE RESEARCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote 'Seedcorn' and 'Pilot' medical research experiments or studies. Grants for travel and/or attendance fees for conferences. Preference given to institutional organisations rather than individual applicants. Funding also available for sponsoring meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
- Throughout London
- Israel
Governance
- 03 March 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSALIND WRIGHT CB QC | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr PANDORA GRABINAR MBBS MRCP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £403 | £147 | £242 | £237 | £325 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 November 2024 | 300 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 FEB 1995
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE PROMOTION OF MEDICAL RESEARCH THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ISRAEL AND THE PUBLICATION AND DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ALL SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) FOR THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE MICROBIOLOGY OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ISRAEL
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 ROWDON AVENUE
LONDON
NW10 2AJ
- Phone:
- 02084596978
- Email:
- d.j.wright@ic.ac.uk
- Website:
-
none.present
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window