Financial history GODINTON PARK PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1044807
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £74.08k £84.28k £73.46k £71.34k £69.75k
Total expenditure £74.86k £72.45k £67.30k £78.30k £76.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.94k N/A N/A N/A