PTA AND FRIENDS OF LYMINGTON CATHOLIC SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arranging various functions to raise money and provide educational enjoyment for the school: fetes and fairs, easter activities, outings, get togethers. The monies raised are then invested in the school and the children as regards equipment, entertainment, extra learning opportunities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 13 March 1995: Standard registration
- LYMINGTON CATHOLIC SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
- OUR LADY AND ST JOSEPH CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Troisi | Chair | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura McIndoe | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Ann Di Maria | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Davies | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gabriella Wheeler | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kayleigh Green | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.32k | £3.90k | £58 | £98 | £1.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.66k | £471 | £216 | £604 | £2.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JANUARY 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Our Lady & St. Joseph
Catholic Primary School
83A Ramley Road
LYMINGTON
Hampshire
SO41 8GY
- Phone:
- 01590672711
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window