FAMILY CARE TRUST

Charity number: 1045025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 09 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 16 December 2016 On time Download