ASSOCIATION OF ISLAMIC CHARITABLE PROJECTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have two principal aims: first, to educate people of all backgrounds about Islamic culture and morals, and second, to warn people against violent extremists that contradict these teachings and we continue to work towards the goal of a peaceful and productive society. Our organisation has a long history of fostering good relations with our non-Muslim neighbours.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Scotland
Governance
- 31 March 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ASHRAF MALHAS | Chair |
|
||||||
Bilal El Fares | Trustee | 20 January 2015 |
|
|||||
HADI FAYED | Trustee |
|
||||||
SHAHID RAUF | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £666.57k | £813.66k | £656.92k | £744.59k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £576.28k | £481.36k | £605.79k | £692.14k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £122.00k | N/A | £143.07k | £144.69k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £284.47k | £95.84k | £1.50k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £376.01k | £314.57k | £228.47k | £384.20k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £27.55k | £10.62k | £3.36k | £3.07k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £124.36k | £56.34k | £254.42k | £208.41k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £78.52k | £93.44k | £74.82k | £61.44k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £60.14k | £338.70k | £95.84k | £87.48k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £576.28k | £481.36k | £605.79k | £692.14k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 17TH FEBRUARY 1994 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29 MAY 2010. AS AMENDED ON 24/01/2015 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 10/05/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ISLAMIC RELIGION AND CULTURE AND THE ARABIC LANGUAGE.(2) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM.(3) TO RELIEVE MUSLIMS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF POVERTY, SICKNESS,DISTRESS OR SUFFERING FROM DISABILITY. (4) TO TAKE CARE OF THE NEGLECTED YOUNG AND THE ELDERLY.
Area of benefit
U.K AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
AICP Sunniyy Centre
FRANCIS STREET
HALIFAX
HX1 5JY
- Phone:
- 01422255883
- Email:
- info@aicp.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window