Financial history AFGHANAID

Charity number: 1045348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £9.60m £8.95m £12.00m £10.85m £7.96m
Total expenditure £9.67m £8.91m £11.67m £10.62m £6.61m
Income from government contracts £6.44m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £4.99m £2.29m £822.03k £748.81k
Income - Donations and legacies £69.06k £74.35k £71.75k £104.44k £1.85m
Income - Other trading activities £63.84k £49.52k £40.82k £35.47k £0
Income - Charitable activities £9.46m £8.76m £11.88m £0 £6.07m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £50.00k £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.21k £22.61k £5.94k £4.15k £329
Income - Other £4.55k £42.63k £6.06k £52.62k £49.45k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.53m £8.76m £11.57m £10.48m £6.46m
Expenditure - Raising funds £145.56k £145.08k £106.87k £141.25k £145.48k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £61.29k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0