LANGO ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Information, advice and support to members and vulnerable communities in the United Kingdom - Advancement of Education for disadvantaged children in the UK - Relief of Poverty - Health Awareness - Cultural Promotion - Youth Peer Support - Emergency Relief
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Uganda
Governance
- 31 March 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lango Association | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Otuko | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Florence Okello-Addai | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Florence Adongo | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martin Lanek | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Ameny | Trustee | 27 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Edward Tito Onapa | Trustee | 25 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY ODUR | Trustee | 03 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Odur | Trustee | 03 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR REAGAN O'DONGO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.18k | £13.99k | £10.87k | £15.30k | £14.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.31k | £11.27k | £8.60k | £11.42k | £20.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 November 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 February 2024 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 February 2023 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST FEBRUARY 1995
Charitable objects
(1)RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST THE INHABITANTS OF LANGO, UGANDA; (11)RELIEVE DISTRESS CAUSED BY NATURAL DISASTERS, SUCH AS DROUGHT; (111)ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LANGO CULTURE; AND (1V)PROTECT AND PRESERVE PUBLIC HEALTH, PARTICULARLY THE HEALTH OF THE LANGO COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION.
Area of benefit
LANGO DISTRICT, UGANDA, AND THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
109a Bramshot Avenue
Charlton.
London
SE7 7HX
- Phone:
- 07846240155
- Email:
- info@langoassociationuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window