ST HUGH'S CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL (TIMPERLEY) PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1045500
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 29 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 27 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 30 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 June 2017 On time Download