MAREMMA WELFARE AND TRAINING

Charity number: 1045512
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 10 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 10 February 2021 347 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 11 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 17 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 10 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required