Financial history ST MARY'S C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1045549
Charity reporting is overdue by 1391 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £8.07k £4.74k £6.62k £5.34k £5.67k
Total expenditure £10.79k £5.61k £3.93k £2.15k £8.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A