SOUTH ENGLAND CONFERENCE OF SEVENTH DAY ADVENTISTS

Charity number: 1045587
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £21.15m £20.88m £20.86m £22.34m £22.18m
Total expenditure £21.13m £19.45m £20.22m £20.66m £22.83m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £2.71m
Income - Donations and legacies £19.01m £18.85m £18.68m £21.53m £16.93m
Income - Other trading activities £321.10k £389.76k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.25m £1.14m £1.68m £619.59k £1.52m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £194.90k £264.65k £92.23k £188.45k £103.21k
Income - Other £369.24k £231.20k £411.56k £0 £3.63m
Income - Legacies £22.15k £10.05k £18.39k £18.39k £18.53k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £21.10m £19.45m £20.22m £20.66m £22.83m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £391 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £29.55k £30.68k £26.16k £22.91k £26.16k
Expenditure - Grants institution £5.92m £0 £5.99m £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0