Accounts and annual returns ST ANDREWS CE AIDED SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1045600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 13 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required