Financial history ST ANDREWS CE AIDED SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1045600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £17.32k £21.72k £23.51k £16.20k £13.96k
Total expenditure £13.70k £17.00k £23.96k £24.39k £10.28k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A