Accounts and annual returns CURDWORTH PLAYGROUP ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1045611
Charity reporting is overdue by 1481 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 20 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 20 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 386 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 386 days
Annual return 31 July 2021 Overdue Overdue by 751 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Overdue Overdue by 751 days
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1116 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1116 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1481 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1481 days