BEARDALL FIELDS PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1045637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £14.91k £13.74k £23.26k £25.14k £4.37k
Total expenditure £14.67k £15.35k £15.27k £22.10k £1.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A