EMERGE POVERTY FREE

Charity number: 1045672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £839.02k £532.51k £822.11k £741.42k £407.60k
Total expenditure £925.98k £671.03k £620.36k £571.15k £938.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £633.24k £467.98k £599.04k £642.80k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £93.23k £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £111.88k £64.30k £223.07k £98.63k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £676 £234 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £198.12k £105.34k £223.92k £369.20k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £521.09k £389.69k £395.65k £495.86k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £367.22k £281.33k £224.72k £75.29k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £36.69k £51.77k £22.42k £3.12k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £292.86k £162.31k £218.48k £462.70k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £37.66k £0 £0 £0 N/A