PROSPECT EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1045736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.90m £2.29m £2.76m £2.08m £1.88m
Total expenditure £1.83m £2.01m £2.78m £2.01m £1.95m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £73.68k £56.79k £129.03k £53.50k £16.34k
Income - Other trading activities £589.68k £897.80k £972.57k £927.67k £905.21k
Income - Charitable activities £1.02m £1.34m £1.66m £1.10m £956.88k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £17 £11 £17 £24 £0
Income - Other £210.55k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.54m £1.65m £2.32m £1.51m £1.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £360.46k £461.03k £497.68k £728.96k
Expenditure - Governance £8.65k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0