HOPE IN CHRIST TRUST SERVING LIVING HOPE MINISTRIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) To advance the Christian religion to proclaim and further the gospel of god and his son the Lord Jesus Christ and to preach and teach the Christian faith. 2) To provide assistance for persons in conditions of need, hardship or distress, priority being given to applicants who are prayer partners of living hope ministries or such other religious institution or body having purposes similar thereto
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
- Cambridgeshire
- East Sussex
- Hampshire
- Norfolk
- Stoke-on-trent City
- Suffolk
- West Sussex
- Throughout London
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Bulgaria
- Burundi
- Colombia
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Croatia
- Ecuador
- Ethiopia
- India
- Kenya
- Liberia
- Macedonia
- Malawi
- Nepal
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Peru
- Philippines
- Poland
- Romania
- Rwanda
- Serbia
- Sierra Leone
- Slovenia
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United States
- Zambia
Governance
- 21 April 1995: Standard registration
- 05 January 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LIVING HOPE MINISTRIES (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.93k | £109.31k | £104.86k | £108.00k | £70.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.47k | £106.50k | £95.29k | £97.59k | £94.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 December 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 04 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 04 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 04 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 04 January 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 APRIL 1995
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION TO PROCLAIM AND FURTHER THE GOSPEL OF GOD AND HIS SON THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND TO PREACH AND TEACH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. 2) TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE FOR PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, PRIORITY BEING GIVEN TO APPLICANTS WHO ARE PRAYER PARTNERS OF LIVING HOPE MINISTRIES OR SUCH OTHER RELIGIOUS INSTITUTION OR BODY HAVING PURPOSES SIMILAR THERETO AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. 3) TO MAKE GIFTS DONATIONS OR LOANS (WHETHER AT INTEREST OR INTEREST FREE) TO ANY CHARITABLE RELIGIOUS INSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window