ENVIRONMENTAL LAW FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1045918
Charity reporting is up to date (65 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £26.02k £16.53k £49.58k £44.50k £61.14k
Total expenditure £20.65k £25.07k £27.23k £42.75k £46.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A