ENVIRONMENTAL LAW FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1045918
Charity reporting is up to date (65 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr JEREMY WOODS Trustee None on record
MARTIN POLDEN Trustee None on record
Joseph Charles Tabone Trustee 29 November 2016
THE PINK SINGERS Recently registered
Solving Kids' Cancer UK Received: On time
DIANA SCHUMACHER Trustee None on record
Carol Anne Day Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
NICHOLAS JOHN FLYNN Trustee 11 February 2014 None on record
RICHARD DANIEL WALD Trustee 27 March 2017 None on record
DAVID HART Chair 21 July 2016
BURNHAM OVERY HARBOUR TRUST Received: On time
KIRSTY SCHNEEBERGER Trustee 22 June 2017 None on record
Michael Taite Trustee
BRICKLEHAMPTON,ELMLEY CASTLE AND NETHERTON VILLAGE COMMUNITY HALL Received: On time