Trustees THE COCHRANE COLLABORATION
Charity number: 1045921

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Gillian Leng | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Wendy Sue Levinson | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Eleanor Beatrice Persad | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Yuan Chi | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Piechotta | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Juan Victor Ariel Franco | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tamara Kredo | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Elizabeth Kelly | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Marshall | Trustee | 08 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sally Elizabeth Green | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jordi Pardo Pardo | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Elizabeth Howe | Trustee | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.