HOPE WORLDWIDE

Charity number: 1045930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.05m £1.01m £1.10m £1.12m £1.21m
Total expenditure £1.04m £1.00m £1.11m £1.06m £1.11m
Income from government contracts £258.05k £210.45k £287.03k £61.61k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £230.15k £324.62k
Income - Donations and legacies £515.62k £369.98k £598.37k £497.67k £464.95k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £536.76k £580.05k £475.67k £609.00k £736.61k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10 £0 £153 £1.43k £1.47k
Income - Other £0 £58.32k £24.27k £6.93k £9.23k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.02m £985.35k £1.07m £1.02m £1.08m
Expenditure - Raising funds £15.85k £19.56k £33.27k £42.91k £31.42k
Expenditure - Governance £10.90k £18.72k £22.32k £20.94k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £256.84k £293.01k £318.64k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0