Trustees THE DIAMOND CENTRE FOR DISABLED RIDERS

Charity number: 1045970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ann Margaret Stuart Trustee 14 October 2021
None on record
Tina Edwards Trustee 29 March 2021
None on record
Matthew Christopher Taylor Trustee 14 December 2020
None on record
Carol Ann Bedwell Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
Claire Fiona Snowdon Trustee 03 September 2020
None on record
Katie Hobden Trustee 09 May 2019
None on record
SANDY PFEIFER Trustee 30 April 2018
None on record
ROBERT CHRISTOPHER MATHEWS Trustee
None on record
STEVEN JOHN AXON Trustee
None on record