ST MARGARET'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1045972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 01 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 25 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 14 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required