ST MARGARET'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1045972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £11.33k £10.68k £12.33k £13.94k £4.11k
Total expenditure £5.75k £17.10k £12.03k £11.89k £7.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A