Trustees CAMBRIDGE JOINT PLAYSCHEMES

Charity number: 1045987
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID JONATHAN HADLEY JONES Chair 03 November 2011
SHELFORD/STAPLEFORD YOUTH INITIATIVE
Received: On time
Alison Walker Trustee 25 July 2022
None on record
Diana Ogunlana Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Paula Michelle Nixon Trustee 28 March 2019
None on record
Wendy Little Trustee 09 March 2017
None on record