GREENFORD AND DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1046044
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alexandra Sian Taylor-Brown Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record
ANDREW KEITH NORMAN Trustee 28 June 2003 None on record
Andrew Appleby Trustee 17 June 2013
8TH GREENFORD (HORSENDEN) SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
STUART LINDSAY DINGWALL Trustee 17 June 2013 None on record
MARIAN CATHERINE MELHUISH Trustee 01 April 1996 None on record
BRYAN KEITH PAYNE Trustee 20 June 2011 None on record
PETER MELVIN Trustee 21 June 2010 None on record
SARAH CATHERINE APPLEBY Trustee 19 June 2017
8TH GREENFORD (HORSENDEN) SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
PHILIP IAN THORNE Trustee 19 June 2017 None on record
RICHARD WILLIAM FOX Trustee 15 July 2020 None on record
IAN DAVID CHICK Chair 28 June 2003 None on record
SUSAN BROOKS Trustee 17 June 2019
FIRST GREENFORD SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
PAUL GRAHAM MELHUISH Trustee 01 April 1996 None on record
CATHERINE STEPHENIE JOYCE MUXLOW Trustee 22 June 2015
FIRST GREENFORD SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
GREATER LONDON MIDDLESEX WEST COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL Received: 20 days late
Dr DALJIT SINGH AUBBY Trustee 19 June 2017 None on record
WILLIAM FRANK JAMES LEWIS Trustee 20 June 2016 None on record