Accounts and annual returns HEDGEHOG HELPLINE

Charity number: 1046156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required