Financial history HEDGEHOG HELPLINE

Charity number: 1046156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.81k £6.32k £7.26k £23.07k £26.03k
Total expenditure £5.11k £6.55k £14.73k £10.46k £8.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A