Trustees 27TH NORWICH (NEW COSTESSEY) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1046258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Claxton | Chair | 11 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Chloe Habgood | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tim Fancy | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carla Steel | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Burton | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jan Moll | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Horsfall | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Louise Green | Trustee | 15 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
William Simon Gallop | Trustee | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAMES HIGHAM | Trustee | 27 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Leeks | Trustee | 18 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALAN ANGELO MOLL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.