Financial history Y GRONFA YMDDIRIEDOLAETH (THE TRUST FUND)

Charity number: 1046291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £7.64k £8.64k £7.15k £7.57k £7.78k
Total expenditure £7.64k £8.64k £0 £0 £7.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A