MOORDALE COURT COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide residential care for people who have learning difficulties or other handicaps.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £248,701 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 10 May 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Ann Parry | Chair | 31 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michele Jukes | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nadine Oliver | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Arnold | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £189.53k | £206.06k | £210.85k | £235.94k | £251.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.55k | £202.74k | £215.06k | £226.76k | £238.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £187.83k | £198.59k | £202.61k | £233.98k | £248.70k | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.56k | £7.46k | £8.24k | £1.51k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 MARCH 1995
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES IN EAST CLEVELAND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY THE PROVISION OF RENTED ACCOMMODATION TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS THE OPPORTUNITY TO HAVE INDEPENDENT LIVING. (2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF RENTED ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS IN EAST CLEVELAND WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH. (3) THE RELIEF OF THOSE PERSONS IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, SICKNESS OR DISABLEMENT BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES AND ASSISTANCE CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THEIR NEEDS
Area of benefit
EAST CLEVELAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Moordale Court
Davison Street
Lingdale
SALTBURN-BY-THE-SEA
Cleveland
TS12 3DX
- Phone:
- 01642284958
- Email:
- moordalectfinance@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window