Accounts and annual returns NEWTON HEATH YOUTH AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1046311
Charity reporting is overdue by 1634 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 173 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 173 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 538 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 538 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 903 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 903 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1268 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1268 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1634 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1634 days