Financial history NEWTON HEATH YOUTH AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1046311
Charity reporting is overdue by 1626 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £14.50k £26.87k £16.47k £13.81k £19.86k
Total expenditure £14.58k £21.56k £12.13k £12.23k £16.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A