THE POPDA SOCIETY

Charity number: 1046323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 December 2017 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 23 February 2018 115 days late Download