Financial history BLAENAU GWENT CARE AND SHARE GROUP

Charity number: 1046350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £3 £1 £1 £1 £0
Total expenditure £706 £766 £706 £545 £514
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A