SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1046413
Charity reporting is overdue by 811 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 80 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 80 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 445 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 445 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 811 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 811 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 03 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 03 May 2018 307 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required